Marine & Waterfront Protection Authority (MWPA)
Member Name | Member Type | Position/Title | Term Ends | Appointed By: | Term Limit |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Mostkoff | Member | Chair | 12/31/2023 | Mark Samuelian | 12/31/2023 |
Dave Doebler | Member | Vice-Chair | 12/31/2022 | Alex Fernandez | 12/31/2029 |
Ms Tasha Byars | Liaison | ||||
Sgt Duane Rezende | Advisor | MB Marine Patrol | |||
Mr Jack Benveniste | Member | 12/31/2023 | Steven Meiner | 12/31/2026 | |
Mr Tim Carr | Member | 12/31/2022 | Mark Samuelian | 12/31/2028 | |
Mr Mike Gibaldi | Member | 12/31/2022 | Ricky Arriola | 12/31/2029 | |
Mr Ronald Issenberg | Member | 12/31/2023 | David Richardson | 12/31/2026 | |
Ms Amy Litos | Member | 12/31/2023 | Alex Fernandez | 12/31/2029 | |
Mr Julio Magrisso | Member | 12/31/2023 | Kristen Rosen Gonzalez | 12/31/2028 | |
Dr Lourdes Oroza | Member | 12/31/2023 | Steven Meiner | 12/31/2023 | |
Daniel Robles | Member | 12/31/2022 | Dan Gelber | 12/31/2024 | |
Mr Robert Schwartz | Member | 12/31/2022 | Ricky Arriola | 12/31/2025 | |
John Gardiner | Member | 12/31/2022 | Dan Gelber | 12/31/2028 | |
Ms. Elaine Roden | Member | 12/31/2022 | Kristen Rosen Gonzalez | 12/31/2028 | |
John Lee | Member | 12/31/2023 |